EP0195292 - Coatings for ink jet nozzles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diaz, Arthur Fred 3864 Wellington Square San Jose California 95136 / US | 02 /
Hernandez, Richard Alexander 4002 Higuera Highland Lane San Jose California 95148 / US | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/39] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86102648.2 | 28.02.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | US19850714770 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: US 714770 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195292 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195292 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195292 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/82, C23C16/00, B41J3/04, G01D15/18 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
C23C16/22 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31699 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/39] | C09D3/82, C23C16/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/39] | Title | German: | Beschichtungen für Druckstrahlspritzköpfe für Tinte | [1986/39] | English: | Coatings for ink jet nozzles | [1986/39] | French: | Revêtements pour buses dans l'impression à jets d'encre | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 20, No. 12, May 1978, B.D. WASHO: "Adhesion of tetrafluorethylene to substrate", page 5233. | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 26, No. 1, June 1983, F. ANGER et al.: "Low surface energy fluoro-epoxy coating for drop-on-demand nozzler", page 431. |