EP0193903 - Production of cytosine nucleosides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawada, Mitsuru 25-3, Tsukaguchicho 4-chome Amagasaki Hyogo 661 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Kiyoharu 39-9, Kita-aobadai Kawachinagano Osaka 586 / JP | 03 /
Tsurushima, Masaaki 240-333, Oaza-aomatani Minoo Osaka 562 / JP | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/37] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102695.3 | 01.03.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | JP19850044219 | 05.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4421985 | [1986/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193903 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193903 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193903 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07H21/00 (KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Cytosin-Nukleosiden | [1986/37] | English: | Production of cytosine nucleosides | [1986/37] | French: | Préparation de nucléosides cytosine | [1986/37] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.1990 | SE | 13.06.1990 | [1991/29] |
Former [1991/12] | SE | 13.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0010205 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) | Examination | - Methoden der organischen Chemie (Houben-Weyl), 4thEdn. (1980), vol. XIII/5, page 133 |