EP0198189 - Process for removing a surface layer from a fluoride glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GALILEO ELECTRO-OPTICS CORPORATION Galileo Park P. O. Box 550 Sturbridge, MA 01566 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states GALILEO ELECTRO-OPTICS CORPORATION Galileo Park P. O. Box 550 Sturbridge, MA 01566 / US | ||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Schneider, Hartmut, Dr. Ignaz-Günther-Str. 42 D-8000 München 81 / DE | ||
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Hartmut, Dr. Ignaz-Günther-Str. 42 D-8000 München 81 / DE | [1990/49] |
Former [1990/29] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1989/50] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1986/43] | 01 /
Schneider, Hartmut, Dr. Ignaz-Günther-Strasse 42 D-8000 München 81 / DE | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/34] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102730.8 | 03.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | DE19853514082 | 18.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3514082 | [1986/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198189 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198189 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198189 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03C15/00, C03B37/025 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
C03C15/00 (EP,US);
Y10S65/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfernen einer Oberflächenschicht von einem Metallfluorid-Glas | [1986/43] | English: | Process for removing a surface layer from a fluoride glass | [1986/43] | French: | Procédé pour enlever une couche de surface d'un verre fluoré | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, Band 67, November 1984, Seiten C238-C239, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.H. FRISCHAT et al.: "Chemical durability of fluorozirconate glasses" | [AP] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, Band 68, Nr. 7, Juli 1985, Seiten C171-C173, Columbus, Ohio, US; D. TREGOAT et al.: "Surface-OH profile from reaction of a heavy-metal fluoride glass with atmospheric water" | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 104, Nr. 4, Januar 1986, Seite 238, Zusammenfassung Nr. 23263t, Columbus, Ohio, US; D. TREGOAT et al.: "Aqueous corrosion of a HMFG", & MATER. SCI. FORUM. 1985, 5(HALIDE GLASSES, VOL. 1), 335-8 | [A] - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, Band 3, Nr. 6, Juni 1984, Seite 484-488, Chapman and Hall Ltd, London, GB; R.H. DOREMUS et al.: "Zirconium fluoride glass: surface crystals formed by reaction with water" |