EP0196474 - Semiconductor device made of compound semiconductor material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beneking, Heinz, Prof. Dr. rer. nat. Waldstrasse 96 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1986/41] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102757.1 | 03.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | DE19853508024 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3508024 | [1986/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196474 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196474 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196474 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/207, H01L21/205, H01L21/208 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
H01L29/207 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/41] | H01L21/20 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/41] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung aus Verbindungshalbleitermaterial | [1986/41] | English: | Semiconductor device made of compound semiconductor material | [1986/41] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur constitué de matériau semi-conducteur composé | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 27.11.1992 | Appeal received No. T0177/93 | 13.02.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.06.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 26.06.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1803731 (PHILIPS NV) | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, Band 61, 1983, Seiten 417-424, North-Holland Publishing Co.; G. JACOB et al.: "Dislocation-free GaAs and inP crystals by isoelectronic doping" | [XP] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, Band 46, Nr. 7, 1. April 1985, Seiten 668-670, American Institute of Physics, Woodbury, New York, US; H. EHRENREICH et al.: "Mechanism for dislocation density reduction in GaAs crystals by indium addition |