EP0195957 - A rack and pinion reaction force sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INCORPORATED Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Robert E. c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 5060 Southfield MI 48086 / US | 02 /
Wakeman, Russell J. c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 5060 Southfield MI 48086 / US | 03 /
Driscoll, Barry J. c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 5060 Southfield MI 48086 / US | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/16] |
Former [1989/13] | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1986/40] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 86102787.8 | 04.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | US19850716288 | 26.03.1985 Original published format: US 716288 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195957 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195957 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195957 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/22 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
G01L5/221 (EP,US);
B62D3/12 (KR);
B62D15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | Reaktionskraftsensor für Zahnstange und Zahnrad | [1986/40] | English: | A rack and pinion reaction force sensor | [1986/40] | French: | Dispositif sensible à la force de réaction entre une crémaillère et une roue dentée | [1986/40] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 16.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1220022 (LEAR SIEGLER INC [US]); | [Y]US3832897 (SCHENCK C); | [A]US4118933 (COLEMAN WILLIAM H, et al) |