EP0193937 - Method and apparatus for measuring the distribution of radioactivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Satoru 14-D-103, Higashi-taga-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Sakagami, Masaharu 419-6 Takaba Katsuta-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | 03 /
Kitaguchi, Hiroshi 908-2 Sugaya Naka-machi Naka-gun Ibaraki 311-01 / JP | 04 /
Kondo, Masahiro 12-1, Ayukawa-cho 6-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/37] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102862.9 | 05.03.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | JP19850044818 | 08.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4481885 | [1986/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193937 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193937 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193937 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/167 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
G01T1/167 (EP,US);
G01T1/2964 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung der Verteilung von Radioaktivität | [1986/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring the distribution of radioactivity | [1986/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la distribution de radioactivité | [1986/37] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 07.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0114968 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US3581090 (BROWN LEONARD CARLTON) |