EP0201680 - Thermostatic switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ossmann, Heinz Emil-Schmid-Strasse 5 D-7263 Bad Liebenzell / DE | [1986/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/47] | Representative(s) | Frank, Gerhard Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/47] | Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102968.4 | 06.03.1986 | [1986/47] | Priority number, date | DE19850013890U | 10.05.1985 Original published format: DE 8513890 U | [1986/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201680 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201680 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H37/54 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
H01H37/54 (EP);
H01H37/5409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/47] | Title | German: | Thermoschalter | [1986/47] | English: | Thermostatic switch | [1986/47] | French: | Interrupteur thermique | [1986/47] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/24] | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.11.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1570321 |