EP0194599 - Benzamide derivatives, process for producing the same, and soil fungicides containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ochiai, Yoshinori Seibutsu Kagaku K. Nissan Chem. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-machi Minami Saitama-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Hanaue, Masami Seibutsu Kagaku K. Nissan Chem. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-machi Minami Saitama-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Mitsumasa c/o Chuo Kenkyusho Hodogaya Chemical Co. Ltd. 6-2-30, Ouji Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kawada, Hiroshi c/o Chuo Kenkyusho Hodogaya Chemical Co. Ltd. 6-2-30, Ouji Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Hoya, Masaaki c/o Chuo Kenkyusho Hodogaya Chemical Co. Ltd. 6-2-30, Ouji Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86103029.4 | 07.03.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | JP19850049275 | 14.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4927585 | JP19860024945 | 08.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2494586 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194599 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194599 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/22, C07C143/78, A01N43/42, A01N41/06 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP);
A01N41/06 (EP);
A01N43/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/38] | C07D215/22, A01N43/42 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/38] | Title | German: | Benzamidderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Boden-Fungizide | [1986/38] | English: | Benzamide derivatives, process for producing the same, and soil fungicides containing the same | [1986/38] | French: | Dérivés de benzamide, leur procédé de préparation et fongicides pour le sol les contenant | [1986/38] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/11] | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.07.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4425343 |