EP0195351 - Dental cast alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thyssen Edelstahlwerke AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Thyssen Edelstahlwerke AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 D-40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rademacher, Leo, Dr.-Ing. Hasenkampweg 29 D-5810 Witten / DE | [1986/39] | Application number, filing date | 86103236.5 | 11.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | DE19853510331 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3510331 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195351 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195351 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/04 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
A61K6/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1986/39] | Title | German: | Dental-Gusslegierung | [1986/39] | English: | Dental cast alloy | [1986/39] | French: | Alliage de fonte dentaire | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/12] | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2000188 (HOWMEDICA); | [X]FR2189526 (WITTEN EDELSTAHL [DE]); | [X]FR2516832 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [XP]DE3436118 (THYSSEN EDELSTAHLWERKE AG) |