EP0200884 - Push-pull radio-frequency power splitter/combiner apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Otward Maria Sweet Road Ballston Lake New York 12019 / US | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103251.4 | 11.03.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | US19850715991 | 25.03.1985 Original published format: US 715991 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200884 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200884 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/48 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
H03H7/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Gegentakt-Hochfrequenz-Leistungs-Teilungsaddiergerät | [1986/46] | English: | Push-pull radio-frequency power splitter/combiner apparatus | [1986/46] | French: | Dispositif diviseur-combineur de puissance haute-fréquence du type push-pull | [1986/46] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/16] | 25.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1498927 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 28, no. 15, July 1980, pages 181-187, Rochelle Park, New JerseyUS; H.O. GRANBERG: "Combine power without compromising performance" | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 16, 1st August 1968, pages 54-59, Rochelle Park, New JerseyUS; J.A. BENJAMIN: "Use hybrid junctions for more VHF power" |