EP0194669 - Arylsulfone compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobe, Akihiro Sakuradai 3 Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujimori, Shinichiro 32-14 Sumiyoshidai Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Tomoshi 5-1 Tsutsujigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Sugano, Mamoru 2-6, Tsuchihashi 3-chome Miyamae-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kikumoto, Ryoji 1521-29, Nogaya-cho Machida Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nitta, Issei 13-22, Narusedai 4-chome Machida Tokyo / JP | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103312.4 | 12.03.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | JP19850051202 | 14.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5120285 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194669 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194669 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194669 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/14, C07D295/08, C07D333/76 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
C07C47/11 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07D333/76 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/38] | C07C147/10, C07C147/11, C07C147/06, C07D295/08, C07D333/76 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/38] | Title | German: | Arylsulfon-Verbindungen | [1986/38] | English: | Arylsulfone compounds | [1986/38] | French: | Composés arylsulfone | [1986/38] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1493848 (ICI LTD); | [Y]GB1512880 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [US]) | [YD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 24, no. 2, February 1981, pages 145-148, American Chemical Society; R. KIKUMOTO et al.: "Synthesis and antidepressant activity of substituted (omega-aminoalkoxy)benzene derivatives" |