EP0196510 - Intrusion warning wire fence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CI.KA.RA. S.p.A. 2/2 Via Zago I-40128 Bologna / IT | [1986/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciordinik, Jacques Via Frino 3 I-40136 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Ciordinik, Federico Via Frino 3 I-40136 Bologna / IT | 03 /
Penzo, Alessandro Via Provinciale 141 I-40056 Crespellano / IT | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 86103333.0 | 12.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | IT19850012464 | 27.03.1985 Original published format: IT 1246485 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196510 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/12 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
G08B13/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Einbruchmeldungsdrahtzaun | [1986/41] | English: | Intrusion warning wire fence | [1986/41] | French: | Clôture en fil métallique avertissant des intrusions | [1986/41] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 15.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 29.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE550105 (EGON LEWIN); | [A]FR2463245 (CI KA RA SRL [IT]); | [A]EP0073927 (CI KA RA SPA [IT]) |