EP0195433 - Amide derivatives processes for preparing them and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [1989/05] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi-1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Kazumasa 7-2-201, Terauchi 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Iwai, Masakazu 5-18, Koyama 5-chome Fujiidera-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Naito, Youichiro 3-1 B46-904, Otokoyama Hachibou Yahata-shi Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Fukaya, Chikara 11-33-604, Kema-cho 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Klaus, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hoffmann, Klaus, Dr. rer. nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/39] | Hoffmann, Klaus, Dr. rer. nat. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103713.3 | 19.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | JP19850055002 | 19.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5500285 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195433 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195433 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C149/24, C07C149/243, C07C148/00, A61K31/16 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/16 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C233/16 (EP);
C07C319/12 (KR);
C07C319/22 (KR);
C07C323/57 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Amidderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1986/39] | English: | Amide derivatives processes for preparing them and use thereof | [1986/39] | French: | Dérivés d'amides, leurs procédés de préparation et leur utilisation | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1445716 [ ]; | EP0170048 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | GB2053204 [ ] (NAT RES DEV) |