EP0196019 - Web-fed rotary offset printing machine with a printing unit for the flying-plate change [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köbler, Ingo Zeisigweg 7 D-8901 Diedorf / DE | [1986/40] | Application number, filing date | 86103809.9 | 20.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | DE19853510823 | 26.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3510823 | [1986/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196019 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196019 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196019 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/02, B41F13/00 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
B41F7/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/40] | B41F7/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | Rollenrotations-Offsetdruckmaschine mit einem Druckwerk für fliegenden Plattenwechsel | [1986/40] | English: | Web-fed rotary offset printing machine with a printing unit for the flying-plate change | [1986/40] | French: | Machine à imprimer rotative offset à bobines avec un mécanisme d'impression pour changement de plaques volant | [1986/40] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2951249 (WIFAG MASCHF); | [A]DE2844418 ; | [A]US3329086 (PULLEN DONALD A); | [A]US4240346 (CRUM JAMES N [US], et al) |