EP0196030 - Hydraulic buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoya, Yuji 178-2, Miyuki Honmachi 7-chome Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Makoto Maruyama Houwa-Ryo, 2216 9-1, Maruyama-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/40] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103921.2 | 21.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | JP19850039818 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: JP 3981885 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196030 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196030 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196030 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/44 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
F16F9/468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/40] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Dämpfer | [1986/40] | English: | Hydraulic buffer | [1986/40] | French: | Amortisseur hydraulique | [1986/40] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5877944 ; | [A]JP59106733 ; | [A]GB2120355 (ATSUGI MOTOR PARTS CO LTD); | [A]GB2126687 (TOKICO LTD); | [A]DE1281865 (CHRISTIAN MARIE LUCIEN LOUIS B) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 173 (M-232)[1318], 30th July 1983; & JP-A-58 77 944 (SHIYOUWA SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 11-05-1983, & JP5877944 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 224 (M-331)[1661], 13th October 1984; & JP-A-59 106 733 (KAYABA KOGYO K.K.) 20-06-1984, & JP59106733 A 00000000 |