EP0196578 - Stationary diffuser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laakso, Oliver Armas Haralyn (West) No. 2 Middle Road Smiths Parish Bermuda 3-18 / BM | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states Laakso, Oliver Armas Haralyn (West) No. 2 Middle Road Smiths Parish Bermuda 3-18 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103932.9 | 14.04.1983 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | US19820374763 | 04.05.1982 Original published format: US 374763 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196578 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196578 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196578 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/04 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
D21C9/04 (EP,US);
B01D29/115 (EP,US);
B01D29/118 (EP,US);
B01D29/606 (EP,US);
B01D29/668 (EP,US);
B01D29/78 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Stillstehender Diffusor | [1986/41] | English: | Stationary diffuser | [1986/41] | French: | Diffuseur stationnaire | [1986/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83103619.9 / EP0093293 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3372087 (RICHTER JOHAN C F C); | [A]US4276167 (RICHTER JOHAN C F C, et al) | [A] - K.W. BRITT: "Handbook of Pulp and Paper Technology", 2nd edition, 1970, pages 287-305, Van Nostrand Reinhold Company, New York, US; H.L. GROSBY: Chapter 4,5 "Bleach plant equipment" |