EP0199121 - Device for fighting insects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO GUIDO DONEGANI S.p.A. Via Caduti del Lavoro I-28100 Novara / IT | [1986/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capizzi, Amedeo 50, via Solari I-20144 Milan / IT | 02 /
Arsura, Emilio 42/d, via Martiri di Cefalonia I-20097 S. Donato Milanese Milan / IT | 03 /
Spinelli, Pia 38, via Cadore I-20135 Milan / IT | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/44] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104016.0 | 24.03.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | IT19850020054 | 25.03.1985 Original published format: IT 2005485 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0199121 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/18 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
A01N25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bekämpfung von Insekten | [1986/44] | English: | Device for fighting insects | [1986/44] | French: | Dispositif pour combattre les insectes | [1986/44] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/27] | 08.02.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2250479 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]FR2346974 (HERCULITE PROTECTIVE FAB [US]); | [X]US4160335 (VON KOHORN HENRY, et al); | [X]GB2018593 (UNILEVER LTD); | [X]FR2503537 (US AGRICULTURE [US]); | [A]US4445641 (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al) |