EP0199987 - Lock, especially for a suitcase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maurus, Georg Nördlingerstrasse 119 D-8901 Königsbrunn / DE | [1986/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Weber, Otto-Ernst Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys. Weber & Heim Hofbrunnstrasse 36 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104020.2 | 24.03.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | DE19853524641 | 10.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524641 | DE19853512414 | 04.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3512414 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199987 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199987 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/04, E05B65/52, A45C13/14 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
E05C9/041 (EP);
E05B47/00 (EP);
E05B47/0002 (EP);
E05B47/0657 (EP);
E05B49/00 (EP);
E05B65/52 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/45] | E05C9/04, E05B65/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/45] | Title | German: | Schloss, insbesondere Kofferschloss | [1986/45] | English: | Lock, especially for a suitcase | [1986/45] | French: | Serrure, notamment pour valise | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/12] | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1988 | 25.04.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4416126 ; | [Y]CH379324 ; | [A]DE3242119 ; | [A]FR2036099 ; | [A]DD155538 ; | [A]CH615241 ; | [A]US3939679 |