EP0196079 - Therapeutic use of tin mesoporphyrin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY 1230 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | [1986/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kappas, Attallah 1161 York Avenue Apt. 4L New York New York 10021 / US | 02 /
Drummond, George S. 304 West 75th Street New York New York 10023 / US | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104120.0 | 25.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | US19850715515 | 25.03.1985 Original published format: US 715515 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196079 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196079 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, C07D487/22 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Verwendung von Zinnmesoporphyrin | [1986/40] | English: | Therapeutic use of tin mesoporphyrin | [1986/40] | French: | Application thérapeutique d'un complexe stannique de la mésoporphyrine | [1986/40] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2809093 [ ] (NIPPON OIL CO LTD, et al); | WO8300287 [ ] (KAPPAS ATTALAH, et al); | US4393071 [ ] (FUJII NAOHARU [JP], et al) |