EP0196087 - Schottky-gate field effect transistor and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Shigeru c/o Osaka Works SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ebata, Toshiki c/o Osaka Works SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/40] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104159.8 | 26.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | JP19850063096 | 26.03.1985 Original published format: JP 6309685 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196087 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196087 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/80, H01L21/28 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
H01L29/66878 (EP,US);
H01L21/28587 (EP,US);
H01L29/42316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/40] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit einem Schottky-Gate und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1986/40] | English: | Schottky-gate field effect transistor and method for its production | [1986/40] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ à grille Schottky et sa méthode de fabrication | [1986/40] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/22] | 19.12.1990 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.12.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57208128 ; | [A]JP59193069 ; | [Y]EP0057558 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0027903 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 62, (E-164)[1207], 15th March 1983; & JP - A - 57 208 128 (FUJITSU K.K.) 21-12-1982, & JP57208128 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 53 (E-301)[1776], 7th March 1985; & JP - A - 59 193 069 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 01-11-1984, & JP59193069 A 00000000 |