EP0238698 - Method and apparatus for generating word model baseforms for speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahl, Lalit Rai Elisha Purdy Road Amawalk, N.Y. 10501 / US | 02 /
Desouza, Peter Vincent 1301 Whitehill Road Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10598 / US | 03 /
Mercer, Robert Leroy 669 Viewland Drive Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10598 / US | 04 /
Picheny, Michael Alan 118 Ralph Avenue White Plains, N.Y. 10606 / US | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto IBM Corporation Intellectcual Property Department Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2009/30] |
Former [1991/13] | Barth, Carl Otto IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1987/40] | Möhlen, Wolfgang C., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 86104226.5 | 27.03.1986 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238698 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238698 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
G10L15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Wortmustern für Spracherkennung | [1987/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for generating word model baseforms for speech recognition | [1987/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour produire des modèles de mots pour la reconnaissance de la parole | [1987/40] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 29.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Atlanta, Georgia, US, 30th March - 1st April 1981, pages 1168-1171, IEEE, New York, US; L.R. BAHL et al.: "Speech recognition of a natural text read as isolated words" |