EP0197451 - Energy submetering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holland, Thomas H. 4708 Ewing Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55410 / US | 02 /
Pejsa, Jane H. 2120 Kenwood Parkway Minneapolis Minnesota 55405 / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104235.6 | 27.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | US19850718147 | 01.04.1985 Original published format: US 718147 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197451 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197451 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01K17/06 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
G01K17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Energieteilzählungssystem | [1986/42] | English: | Energy submetering system | [1986/42] | French: | Système pour le sous-comptage de l'énergie | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2003612 ; | [X]GB2062216 ; | [X]DE3309315 ; | [X]EP0018566 ; | [A]DE3303769 |