EP0197483 - Safety reservoir snap on overcap for parenteral drug container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | ||
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, David S. 2 Roosevelt Drive Middlesex New Jersey 08846 / US | 02 /
Stark, Don C. 500 S. Manlius Fayetteville New York 13066 / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/42] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patent Attorneys, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Sternwartstrasse 4 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104379.2 | 01.04.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | US19850719384 | 02.04.1985 Original published format: US 719384 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197483 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197483 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197483 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/18, B65D41/18, B65D51/00 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
B65D51/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/42] | B65D51/18, B65D41/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinschnappüberkappe für parenterale Produkte haltende Behälter | [1986/42] | English: | Safety reservoir snap on overcap for parenteral drug container | [1986/42] | French: | Capuchon de surbouchage de sécurité à enclenchement pour récipients contenant des produits parentéraux | [1986/42] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.05.1986 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 | 01.05.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   15.05.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4133441 (MITTLEMAN HERBERT, et al); | [A]US4152269 (BABSON ARTHUR L [US]); | [A]US4465200 (PERCARPIO EDWARD P [US]) |