EP0200012 - Process for producing aromatic polyester fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN EXLAN COMPANY, LTD. 2-8, Dojimahama-2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN EXLAN COMPANY, LTD. 2-8, Dojimahama-2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimoto, Hiroaki 13-5, Kawanishicho-1-chome Takatsuki-shi / JP | 02 /
Hayatsu, Kazuo 11-8, Kamihozumi-2-chome Ibaraki-shi / JP | 03 /
Kobashi, Toshiyuki 1-6, Saidaijikami-3-chome Okayama-shi / JP | 04 /
Takao, Seiji 781-3, Kanada Okayama-shi / JP | 05 /
Takagi, Jun 615-1, Kanaokanishimachi Okayama-shi / JP | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104409.7 | 01.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | JP19850069595 | 02.04.1985 Original published format: JP 6959585 | JP19850069596 | 02.04.1985 Original published format: JP 6959685 | JP19850135721 | 20.06.1985 Original published format: JP 13572185 | JP19850186430 | 23.08.1985 Original published format: JP 18643085 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200012 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200012 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200012 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62, D01F6/84, D01F6/92, D06M11/00 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
D06M11/46 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D06M11/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | D01F6/62, D01F6/84, D01F6/92, D06M5/08 | ||
Former IPC [1986/45] | D06M11/04, D06M11/12, D06M5/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von aromatischen Polyesterfasern | [1986/45] | English: | Process for producing aromatic polyester fiber | [1986/45] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de fibres de polyesters aromatiques | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 15.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2942325 (SPELLMAN JR FLOYD E); | [A]US3567817 (SPILLER HERBERT A); | [A]DE2517958 (CARBORUNDUM CO); | [A]US4183895 (LUISE ROBERT R [US]); | [A]EP0041327 (ICI PLC [GB]) |