EP0198369 - Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid aryl imides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spietschka, Ernst, Dr. Kirchweg 3 D-6270 Idstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Tröster, Helmut, Dr. Am Erdbeerstein 44 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1986/43] | Application number, filing date | 86104677.9 | 05.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | DE19853513358 | 15.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3513358 | [1986/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198369 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198369 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198369 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B5/62 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
C09B5/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Perylen-3,4,9,10-tetracarbonsäurearylimiden | [1986/43] | English: | Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid aryl imides | [1986/43] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'arylimides de l'acide pérylène-3,4,9,10-tétracarboxylique | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1807729 (BASF AG); | [A]DE2210170 (BASF AG) |