EP0208841 - Uretral catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun-SSC AG Gerliswilstrasse 74 6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states B. Braun-SSC AG Gerliswilstrasse 74 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | ||
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states INTERMEDICAT GMBH Gerliswilstrasse 74 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerlach, Roland Kirchweg 9 D-3501 Guxhagen / DE | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/04] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104909.6 | 10.04.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | DE19853525165 | 13.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3525165 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208841 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208841 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208841 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
A61M27/008 (EP);
A61F2/04 (EP);
A61M25/007 (EP);
A61M25/0075 (EP);
A61M2210/1078 (EP);
A61M27/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Harnleiterkatheter | [1987/04] | English: | Uretral catheter | [1987/04] | French: | Cathéter urétéral | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/08] | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4227533 (GODFREY JOHN C); | [Y]US4240434 (NEWKIRK JOHN B [US]); | [AD]DE7904093U ; | [XP]US4571241 (CHRISTOPHER T GRAHAM [US]) |