EP0241565 - Method for determining the sojourn cell of a mobile station in a mobile radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sperlich, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Kelterweg 52 D-7150 Backnang / DE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/46] |
Former [1987/43] | Schickle, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gerberstrasse 33 D-7150 Backnang / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104975.7 | 11.04.1986 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241565 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241565 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26, G01S1/08 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP);
G01S1/08 (EP);
H04B7/2684 (EP);
H04W56/009 (EP);
H04W56/0095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ermitteln der Aufenthaltsfunkzelle einer Mobilstation innerhalb eines Mobilfunknetzes | [1987/43] | English: | Method for determining the sojourn cell of a mobile station in a mobile radio network | [1987/43] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination de la cellule de séjour d'une station mobile dans un réseau radio-mobile | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 11.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3335128 ; | [A]DE3242997 ; | [A]GB2017448 | [AD] - FUNKSCHAU, Band 2, 17. Januar 1986, Seiten 43-48, München, DE; G.-L. RADKE: "Das neue Funk-Telefonnetz "C": Digital signalisiert" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, Band VT-26, Nr. 1, Februar 1977, Seiten 7-11, New York, US; S. RITER et al.: "Automatic vehicle location - An overview" |