EP0200084 - Roof tray for the sliding roof of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clausen-Schaumann, Andreas Jägerstrasse 15 D-8139 Bernried / DE | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung AJ-31 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung AJ-31 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105146.4 | 15.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | DE19853515527 | 30.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3515527 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200084 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200084 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200084 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/04 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
B60J7/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugdach mit einer einen Deckel aufnehmenden Dachkassette | [1986/45] | English: | Roof tray for the sliding roof of a vehicle | [1986/45] | French: | Coffret de toit ouvrant de véhicules | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57007768 ; | [Y]DE2856015 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W); | [Y]GB2113632 (TALBOT MOTOR); | [A]FR1438708 (WILMOT BREEDEN LTD); | [A]DE2317546 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [E]FR2577175 (RENAULT [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 69 (M-125)[947], 30. April 1982; & JP-A-57 007 768 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 14-01-1982, & JP57007768 A 00000000 | Examination | US2062177 | DE3044313 | DE8132258U |