EP0203340 - Method for removing light volatile pollutants from gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 D-60314 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eschwey, Manfred, Dr. Kreuzbergstrasse 7H D-4000 Düsseldorf 31 / DE | 02 /
Schleser, Werner Uhlandstrasse 25 D-4100 Duisburg 14 / DE | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 86105258.7 | 16.04.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | DE19853518283 | 22.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518283 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203340 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203340 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D8/00 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
B01D8/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung leichter flüchtiger Verunreinigungen aus Gasen | [1986/49] | English: | Method for removing light volatile pollutants from gases | [1986/49] | French: | Procédé pour séparer les pollutions les plus volatiles des gaz | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 10.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP74117365 ; | [A]US2177139 (LEO HORVITZ); | [X]FR2134845 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 84, Nr. 18, 13. Mai 1976, Seite 125, Zusammenfassung Nr. 123972k, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 74 117 365 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD) 09-11-1974, & JP74117365 A 00000000 | Examination | US3364654 | US3585807 | US3721101 | US4191022 | US4479927 | US4506513 |