EP0211147 - Epoxy resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Kazuo Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ando, Toshiharu Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Itabashi, Yoshifumi Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Seisakusho 1-1, Tsukaguchi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105284.3 | 16.04.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | JP19850159139 | 18.07.1985 Original published format: JP 15913985 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211147 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211147 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, H01B3/40 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
C08G59/4276 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L81/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1987/09] | Title | German: | Epoxidharzzusammensetzung | [1987/09] | English: | Epoxy resin composition | [1987/09] | French: | Composition de résine époxyde | [1987/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1566365 ; | [X]DE2052225 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US3819472 (VASTA J); | [A]EP0151553 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]EP0161576 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |