EP0200970 - Digital-to-analog converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states Nippon Gakki Seizo Kabushiki Kaisha 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohdaka, Takayuki c/o NIPPON GAKKI SEIZO K.K. 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Katsuhiko c/o NIPPON GAKKI SEIZO K.K. 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Toshiyuki c/o NIPPON GAKKI SEIZO K.K. 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Ogata, Takashi c/o NIPPON GAKKI SEIZO K.K. 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Ismaninger Strasse 108 Postfach 860329 D-8000 München 86 / DE | ||
Former [1986/46] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105344.5 | 17.04.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | JP19850083819 | 19.04.1985 Original published format: JP 8381985 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200970 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200970 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200970 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/68 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
H03M1/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1986/46] | Title | German: | Digital/Analogwandler | [1986/46] | English: | Digital-to-analog converter | [1986/46] | French: | Convertisseur numérique-analogique | [1986/46] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1987 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2022347 (BENDIX CORP); | [A]US4278964 (VANDERFORD JAMES R); | [Y]GB2093297 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 5, no. 5, October 1962, pages 30-31, New York, US; T.J. HARRISON: "Logarithmic digital to analog converter" | [A] - NEW ELECTRONICS, vol. 16, no. 2, 25th January 1983, pages 92-93, London, GB; J. MULLEN: "Specifying and using the digital-to-analogue converter" | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 31, no. 3, February 1982, pages 78-80, Munich, DE; G. HEINLE: "Gleitkomma-D/A-Umsetzer verringert Quantisierungsfehler" |