EP0203388 - Light scan device with a light concentrator for monitoring surface quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.1991 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Sick GmbH Optik-Elektronik Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 D-79183 Waldkirch / DE | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dabelstein, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Gut Schmalzhof D-8134 Pöcking/Starnberg / DE | 02 /
Skrobol, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Leitenstrasse 14 D-8084 Inning / DE | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/49] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105765.1 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | DE19853518832 | 24.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518832 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203388 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203388 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/89 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
G01N21/8901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Oberflächenbeschaffenheitsfeststellungs-Lichtabtastvorrichtung mit einem Lichtkonzentrator | [1986/49] | English: | Light scan device with a light concentrator for monitoring surface quality | [1986/49] | French: | Dispositif de balayage lumineux pour le contrôle d'états de surface, utilisant un concentrateur de lumière | [1986/49] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/16] | 25.11.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0123929 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]); | [A]EP0075766 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE707745 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4378159 (GALBRAITH LEE K); | [A]US3845297 (MAEDA I, et al) |