EP0243521 - Preparation for oral administration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thorn, Werner Prof. Dr. Am Langenzug 9 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | [1987/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1987/45] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105940.0 | 30.04.1986 | [1987/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243521 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/50 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
A61K9/0007 (EP);
A61K9/1641 (EP);
A61K9/2031 (EP);
A61K9/2095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Oral verabreichbares Präparat | [1987/45] | English: | Preparation for oral administration | [1987/45] | French: | Préparation pour administration orale | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/52] | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.05.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2858001 ; | [Y]FR2350102 ; | [Y]US2540253 ; | [A]FR2293438 ; | [A]DE2251199 |