EP0204157 - Polymeric compositions suitable for use as bitumen modifiers and bituminous compositions so modified [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | [1990/36] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.p.A. Foro Buonaparte, 31 I-20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciaccia, Vittorio 26, Via Carri I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
Milani, Federico 2, via Kennedy I-45030 S. Maria Maddalena/Rovigo / IT | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/50] | Jaumann, Paolo Studio Consulenza Brevetti Jaumann Piazza Castello, 2 I-20121-Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86106067.1 | 02.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | IT19850020638 | 09.05.1985 Original published format: IT 2063885 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204157 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204157 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L23/16, // C08L23/12, C08L23/06, C08L23/08 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L23/16, C08L23/12, C08L23/06, C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/50] | Title | German: | Zur Modifizierung von Bitumen verwendbare Polymerzusammensetzungen und so modifizierte Bitumenmassen | [1986/50] | English: | Polymeric compositions suitable for use as bitumen modifiers and bituminous compositions so modified | [1986/50] | French: | Compositions polymères pouvant servir à la modification du bitume et compositions bitumineuses ainsi modifiées | [1986/50] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 11.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3790519 (WAHLBORG H); | [X]EP0131397 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) | Examination | - Römpps Chemie-Lexikon, page 3311 |