EP0213275 - Automatic mechanical pencil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Co., Ltd. 9-17, 2-chome, Kamatahoncho Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states MICRO CO., LTD. 9-17, 2-chome, Kamatahoncho Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakaoka, Gouji Luna Tokiwa, 10-13 Kamatahoncho 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/11] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106534.0 | 14.05.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | JP19850174992 | 10.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17499285 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213275 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213275 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B43K21/02 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
B43K21/027 (EP);
B43K21/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/11] | Title | German: | Automatischer Füllminenstift | [1987/11] | English: | Automatic mechanical pencil | [1987/11] | French: | Porte-mine automatique | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.1990
03.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE J. S. Staedtler GmbH & Co. Moosäckerstr. 3 D- 90427 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Charrier, Rolf Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.1990
03.01.1991
ADMISSIBLE J. S. Staedtler GmbH & Co. Moosäckerstr. 3 D- 90427 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Charrier, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Charrier, Dr. Rapp, Dr. Waibel, Dr. Bauer Rehlingenstrasse 8 D-86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.1990
J. S. Staedtler GmbH & Co. Moosäckerstr. 3 D- 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 09.01.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.07.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 25.09.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.05.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.06.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3229498 (STAEDTLER FA J S [DE]); | [Y]DE2821625 (ANCOS CO LTD); | [X]US3424535 (SCHISCHKOW KONSTANTIN F); | [X]US3864046 (BUTKA KEMAL); | [X]DE2153400 (BUTKA KEMAL DIPL ING); | [A]US4411543 (HASHIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE2447431 (FABER CASTELL A W); | [A]US3544228 (WITTROCK LUDWIG) |