EP0204188 - Light transmitting sound absorption construction plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLACHGLAS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Otto-Seeling-Promenade 10-14 90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states FLACHGLAS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Otto-Seeling-Promenade 10-14 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhmer, Walter, Dipl.-Phys. Buer-Gladbecker-Strasse 53b D-4650 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Reichmann, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Am Dahlbusch 78 D-4650 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Andrejewski, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106583.7 | 15.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | DE19853518154 | 21.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518154 | [1986/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204188 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204188 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, E04B1/86 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
B32B17/10045 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
E04B1/86 (EP);
E06B5/205 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (US);
E04B2001/8461 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Durchsichtige Schalldämmbauplatte | [1986/50] | English: | Light transmitting sound absorption construction plate | [1986/50] | French: | Panneau de construction transparent et absorbant | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3249178 (WATTERS BILL G); | [A]DE2332915 ; | [Y]DE2929491 (DANSK PLASTPLADE VAERK); | [A]FR2516646 (BOUSSOIS SA [FR]) |