EP0204190 - Drive arrangement for compressor of a transport refrigeration unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Donald Keith 8667 Rich Road Bloomington Minnesota 55437 / US | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86106611.6 | 15.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | US19850741093 | 04.06.1985 Original published format: US 741093 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204190 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204190 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/00, F25B27/00 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
B60H1/3222 (EP,KR,US);
F04B35/00 (KR);
F16D27/108 (KR);
F16D27/112 (EP);
F16D43/18 (EP,KR);
F25B27/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/50] | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung für Kompressor von einer transportierbaren Kühlanlage | [1986/50] | English: | Drive arrangement for compressor of a transport refrigeration unit | [1986/50] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour compresseur d'une installation réfrigérante transportable | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2450382 [ ] (LABOURIER ROBERT); | FR2434961 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | US4450942 [ ] (TAKEFUTA HIDEYASU [JP], et al); | DE1950316 [ ] (ANGLIN WILLIAM E [US], et al); | DE1476990 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | DE3234106 [ ] (THERMO KING CORP [US]) |