EP0203487 - Compatible polymer mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liebler, Ralf, Dr. Alfred-Messel-Weg 12 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Ringenberg, Werner Hahlgartenstrasse 1 D-6108 Weiterstadt 1 / DE | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 86106769.2 | 17.05.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | DE19853518538 | 23.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518538 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203487 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203487 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C09D3/80, C09D3/76, C08L33/06, C08L27/06, C08L27/16, C08L69/00, C09D3/49 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C08L27/16 (EP,US);
C08L33/062 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L33/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L27/16, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L33/062, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L33/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/49] | Title | German: | Verträgliche Polymermischungen | [1986/49] | English: | Compatible polymer mixtures | [1986/49] | French: | Mélanges polymères compatibles | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1269799 (DU PONT); | [X]GB2137935 (ROEHM GMBH); | [A]GB2146647 (ROEHM GMBH) |