EP0205012 - Method for preparing siloxane-carbonate block copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Thomas Lane 3 Earl Court Clifton Park, N.Y. 12065 / US | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/46] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/51] | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86107043.1 | 23.05.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | US19850743446 | 11.06.1985 Original published format: US 743446 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205012 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205012 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205012 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/42 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
C08G64/186 (EP,US);
C08G77/448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von siloxan- und carbonatenthaltenden Blockcopolymeren | [1986/51] | English: | Method for preparing siloxane-carbonate block copolymers | [1986/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation de copolymères blocs siloxane et carbonate | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3051684 (MAURICE MORTON, et al); | [A]FR2295046 (SWS SILICONES CORP [US]); | [A]FR2383984 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]US3189662 (VAUGHN JR HOWARD A) |