EP0205958 - Yarn guiding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/52] | Bobbin inserting device | ||
[1990/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slavik, Walter Einsiedlerstrasse 280 CH-8810 Horgen / CH | 02 /
Luz, Rudolf Hintere Etzelstrasse 28 CH-8810 Horgen / CH | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86107106.6 | 04.05.1984 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | GB19830013994 | 20.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8313994 | GB19830033471 | 15.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8333471 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205958 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205958 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205958 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/34, D01H1/38 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
B65H54/34 (EP,US);
B65H65/00 (EP,US);
B65H67/04 (EP,US);
B65H67/0417 (EP,US);
B65H67/067 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1986/52] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Führen eines Garnes | [1990/26] | English: | Yarn guiding device | [1990/26] | French: | Dispositif de guidage de fil | [1990/26] |
Former [1986/52] | Spulenhülsen-Einlegevorrichtung | ||
Former [1986/52] | Bobbin inserting device | ||
Former [1986/52] | Dispositif de mise en place de support de bobines | Examination procedure | 20.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84105036.2 / EP0126352 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2247906 (ROANNAIS CONST TEXTILES ATEL [FR]); | [X]US4195788 (MIYAZAKI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) |