EP0204256 - Agglomeration method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noreille, Philippe 5, rue Nully d'Hécourt F-6000 Beauvais / FR | 02 /
Pot, Athol Robert 31, Pesiaran Bruas 50490 Kuala Lumpur / MY | [1986/50] | Application number, filing date | 86107211.4 | 28.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | US19850741456 | 05.06.1985 Original published format: US 741456 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204256 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204256 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204256 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/02, A23F5/38, A23F3/32 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
A23G1/56 (EP);
A23F5/12 (KR);
A23F3/32 (EP);
A23F5/38 (EP);
A23G1/047 (EP);
A23P10/20 (EP);
A23G2200/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G1/56, A23G2200/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Agglomerationsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [1986/50] | English: | Agglomeration method and apparatus | [1986/50] | French: | Procédé et installation d'agglomération | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.12.1991 | [1992/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1142843 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [X]DE2035071 ; | [X]DE1667127 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [X]DE2044489 |