EP0205980 - Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid dianhydride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spietschka, Ernst, Dr. Am Rödchen 8 D-6270 Idstein / DE | 02 /
Urban, Manfred Steigerwaldstrasse 2a D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86107318.7 | 30.05.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19853520807 | 11.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3520807 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205980 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205980 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/78 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
C07C51/54 (EP,US);
C07C51/56 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/54, C07C63/48 (EP,US);
C07C51/56, C07C63/48 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Perylen-3,4,9,10-tetracarbonsäuredianhydrid | [1986/52] | English: | Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid dianhydride | [1986/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation du dianhydride de l'acide perylène-3,4,9,10-tétracarboxylique | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 76, Nr.11, 13. März 1972, Seite 441, Zusammenfassung 59297z, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. NAGAO et al.: "Decomposition of perylenetetracarboxylic acid diimide in sulfuric acid" & KOGYO KAGAKU ZASSHI 1971, 74(12), 2500-2 |