EP0207322 - Connector plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Noboru 1698-8, Oaza Higoshi Tamamura-machi Sawa-gun Gunma / JP | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107694.1 | 05.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | JP19850086147U | 07.06.1985 Original published format: JP 8614785 U | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207322 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207322 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
H01R9/05 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R13/65912 (EP,US);
H01R13/6583 (EP,US);
H01R24/86 (EP);
H01R13/6592 (EP,US);
Y10S439/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstecker | [1989/21] | English: | Connector plug | [1987/02] | French: | Fiche de connexion | [1987/02] |
Former [1987/02] | Steckeranschluss | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/21: Divisional application 87108985 filed on 23.06.87 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87108985.0 / EP0249250 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU3468 ; | [A]GB723084 (CARR FASTENER CO LTD); | [X]GB887853 (ARIEL PRESSINGS LTD); | [AD]JPS5979986U ; | [X]EP0118168 (AMP INC [US]) |