EP0205126 - Shoe for rehabilitation purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUMA-Sportschuhfabriken Rudolf Dassler KG Würzburger Strasse 13 D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | [1986/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhard, Constantin Hohenzollern Platz 2 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Hufnagel, Walter, et al Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Hufnagel, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Dorner & Hufnagel Patentanwälte Bad Brückenauer Str. 19 D-90427 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107735.2 | 06.06.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | DE19853520786 | 10.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3520786 | [1986/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205126 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205126 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/00 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
A43B7/144 (EP,US);
A43B7/00 (EP,US);
A43B7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Schuh für Rehabilitationszwecke | [1986/51] | English: | Shoe for rehabilitation purposes | [1986/51] | French: | Chaussure de rééducation | [1986/51] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/24] | 24.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2360272 (DASSLER ADOLF [DE]); | [A]US4302892 (ADAMIK JAROSLAV F); | [A]WO8200572 (BRS INC [US]); | [AP]DE8603370U |