EP0206069 - Multi-stage particulate material dryer having channelized discharge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westelaken, Christianus Marinus Theresia Box 730, RR No. 2 St. Mary's Ontario NOM 2VO / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states Westelaken, Christianus Marinus Theresia Box 730, RR No. 2 St. Mary's Ontario NOM 2VO / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Newby, John Ross, et al JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Newby, John Ross, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86107817.8 | 17.06.1982 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | US19810275312 | 19.06.1981 Original published format: US 275312 | US19810275313 | 19.06.1981 Original published format: US 275313 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206069 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206069 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/12, F26B25/00 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
F26B17/122 (EP);
F26B25/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Mehrstufentrockner für körniges Material mit kanalisierter Entleerung | [1986/52] | English: | Multi-stage particulate material dryer having channelized discharge | [1986/52] | French: | Séchoir à étages multiples pour matière granuleuse comportant un dispositif d'évacuation canalisée | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 13.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/27] | 11.02.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82303149.7 / EP0068734 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB190920758 ; | [Y]DE1803052 ; | [A]US2732630 ; | [A]GB213799 ; | [A]US3426442 ; | [A]DE1729452 |