EP0211185 - Method for manufactoring an actuating button with a metallic appearance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Beethovenstrasse 1 D-8502 Zirndorf / DE | [1987/09] | Application number, filing date | 86107901.0 | 10.06.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | DE19853526592 | 25.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3526592 | [1987/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211185 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/14, B29C65/44 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
B29C66/74 (EP);
B29C63/22 (EP);
B29C65/44 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/116 (EP);
B29C66/5326 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C69/00 (EP);
B29D19/00 (EP);
B44C1/14 (EP);
B44C3/08 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bedienknopfes mit Metalleffekt | [1987/09] | English: | Method for manufactoring an actuating button with a metallic appearance | [1987/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un bouton de commande avec effet métallique | [1987/09] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/16] | 20.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0130424 ; | [A]DE2755848 ; | [A]EP0097302 ; | [A]CH401723 ; | [A]DE2753303 |