EP0205157 - Method of manufacturing multi-layer resin material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1986/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Toyokazu 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyama, Masao 77, Azu Ichihara Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugimura, Hideo 12-13, Kiyomidaiminami 2-chome Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Shinohara, Takeshi 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/51] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107915.0 | 10.06.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | JP19850125930 | 10.06.1985 Original published format: JP 12593085 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205157 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205157 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205157 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/04, B29C47/06 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
B29B17/0005 (EP,US);
B29C48/30 (KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/307 (EP,US);
B29C48/70 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/95 (EP,US);
B29C48/17 (EP,US);
B29C48/19 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mehrschichtwerkstoffen aus Kunststoff | [1986/51] | English: | Method of manufacturing multi-layer resin material | [1986/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux multicouches en matière synthétique | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 25.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.09.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 09.12.1992 | Appeal received | 09.02.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.12.1993 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.1994 | NL | 02.11.1994 | SE | 02.02.1995 | [1996/03] |
Former [1995/41] | BE | 02.11.1994 | |
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 02.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2065631 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [X]US3909170 (RIBOULET ROBERT, et al); | [A]FR2437289 (ONO); | [A]EP0010895 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [X]DE3010691 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0050476 (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]); | [YD]JPS591179B ; | [A]US4443397 (HAHN GRANVILLE J [US], et al); | [A]GB2139553 (COSDEN TECHNOLOGY) |