EP0207333 - Electrodeless high pressure sodium iodide arc lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dakin, James Thomas 1413 Fox Hollow Road Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Anderson, John Melvin 17 Cedar Lane Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 03 /
Bhattacharya, Ashok Kumar 1168 Ford Road Lyndhurst, Ohio 44124 / US | [1990/43] |
Former [1990/24] | 01 /
Dakin, James Thomas 1413 Fox Hollow Schenectady New York 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Anderson, John Melvin 17 Cedar Lane Scotia, New York 12302 / US | |||
03 /
Bhattacharya, Ashok Kumar 1168 Ford Road Lyndhurst, Ohio 44124 / US | |||
Former [1987/02] | 01 /
Dakin, James Thomas 1413 Fox Hollow Schenectady New York 12309 / US | Representative(s) | Sieb, Rolf Finstertal 12 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1987/02] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86107919.2 | 10.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | US19850749025 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: US 749025 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207333 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207333 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
H01J65/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/02] | Title | German: | Elektrodenfreie Hochdrucknatriumiodidbogenlampe | [1987/02] | English: | Electrodeless high pressure sodium iodide arc lamp | [1987/02] | French: | Lampe à arc à l'iodure de sodium à haute pression sans électrode | [1987/02] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 02.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2339665 [ ] (CHARYBDIS INC); | GB2030762 [ ] (GTE LABORATORIES INC); | EP0076649 [ ] (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US], et al); | EP0183247 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | EP0183248 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |