EP0208913 - Method and apparatus for the end face welding of sheaves of thermoplastic parts by applying pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1987/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Heinz, Dr. Ing. Am Erlenbusch 2 D-6109 Mühltal / DE | 02 /
Pöhlmann, Klaus Ernst Silcherweg 9 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Schikowsky, Hartmut Karlstrasse 1 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1987/04] | Application number, filing date | 86107987.9 | 11.06.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | DE19853522190 | 21.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522190 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208913 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208913 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/20 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/0342 (EP,US);
B29C66/137 (EP,US);
B29C66/5227 (EP,US);
B29C66/7352 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81811 (EP,US);
B29C66/91421 (EP,US);
B29C66/91445 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29C66/91921 (EP,US);
B29C66/91931 (EP,US);
B29C66/91933 (EP,US);
B29C66/91935 (EP,US);
F28F1/006 (EP,US);
F28F21/062 (EP,US);
B29C65/305 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0073 (EP,US);
B29L2031/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/085 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum stirnseitigen Verschweissen von Bündeln von Formkörpern aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff unter Druckanwendung | [1987/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for the end face welding of sheaves of thermoplastic parts by applying pressure | [1987/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le soudage frontal d'ensembles de corps moulés en matière thermoplastique sous pression | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 03.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2603615 [ ]; | DE2420477 [ ] (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES); | US2994361 [ ] (GABLE HOWARD S, et al); | US4085185 [ ] (ADAIR EDWIN L); | DE840668 [ ] (SATTLER ATLAN WERK KG L) |