EP0206196 - Control device for the double threads in warp tying machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZELLWEGER USTER AG Wilstrasse 11 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [1986/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plaschy, Martin Treppenweg 4 CH-8635 Hombrechtikon / CH | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86108183.4 | 16.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | CH19850002716 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: CH 271685 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206196 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206196 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206196 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D03J1/18, D03J1/16 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
D03J1/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/52] | D03J1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Ueberwachungsvorrichtung für Doppelfäden an Webkettenknüpfmaschinen | [1986/52] | English: | Control device for the double threads in warp tying machines | [1986/52] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle pour les fils doubles dans les noueuses de chaîne | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH415488 (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]); | [A]US3840951 (TOWNSEND F); | [A]EP0023583 (AKZO GMBH [DE]) |